U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Mayes v. Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • December 05, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 07, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.