U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Elhabti
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [USCA Order]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Letter - Original File Sent to USCA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 04, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 04, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • August 05, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 01, 2022: [Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order for Response]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 07, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.