U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Johnson v. McCurdy et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Address Change]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Declaration]
  • October 20, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 13, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • September 15, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 15, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • August 22, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • July 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • July 08, 2022: [Declaration]
  • July 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • July 08, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • July 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • May 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • May 06, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2022: [Summons Reissued - Alias]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order for Response]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sealed Exhibit]
  • April 28, 2022: [Special Report]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 27, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 07, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 07, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.