U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00028
  • Case Name: Landmark American Insurance Company v. Kruse & Associates Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • December 01, 2022: [Docket]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2022: [Objections]
  • October 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 20, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • September 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Intervene]
  • June 24, 2022: [Intervene]
  • June 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2022: [Entry of Default]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 01, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • April 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.