U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00029
  • Case Name: Dotson et al v. Transworld Systems Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 10, 2022: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • May 10, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Leave to File Reply]
  • March 30, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 30, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 28, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 16, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 10, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 10, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • January 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.