U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Sneed v. Independent School District No. 16 of Payne County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 10, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.