U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Syrus v. National Basketball Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.