U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Chilton v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended)]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
  • February 07, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 11, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 11, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.