U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Alvarez et al v. Landstar Ranger Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 08, 2022: [Settlement]
  • September 02, 2022: [Docket]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 30, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 30, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 10, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • August 08, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 04, 2022: [Leave]
  • August 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Objections]
  • July 19, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • July 19, 2022: [Witness List]
  • July 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • July 05, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 02, 2022: [Docket]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • January 17, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • January 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • January 17, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • January 13, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.