U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Davis v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 09, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Letter]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 12, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 12, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.