U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Kruse et al v. Howell
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Administrative Closing Order]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • December 05, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.