U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Wallace v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • January 20, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 17, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • September 12, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 12, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 12, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 11, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 04, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 12, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.