U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Settles v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Supplement]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 19, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 18, 2023: [Reply]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 11, 2023: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 06, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 23, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 23, 2022: [Witness List]
  • November 10, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.