U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Hooper v. Pettigrew et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 10, 2022: [Receipt]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 04, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 13, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 13, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.