U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00043
  • Case Name: Augustus et al v. Isley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Show Cause]
  • January 04, 2023: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Joint Status Report]
  • December 01, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • November 09, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 28, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • March 10, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • January 14, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 14, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.