U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Allen v. Pettigrew et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 14, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 14, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.