U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00049
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Moses et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 10, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 01, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 11, 2022: [Supplement]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.