U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Smith v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 11, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 06, 2023: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • January 06, 2023: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • December 09, 2022: [Leave]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave]
  • November 08, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 28, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 28, 2022: [Brief]
  • October 25, 2022: [Leave]
  • October 21, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 16, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order for Response]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 18, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 18, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.