U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Hammond v. Little Axe County Sheriff's Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 26, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 15, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • March 04, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 19, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.