U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Dorantes v. Nye et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 17, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • December 01, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Court Exhibit]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 28, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 28, 2022: [Special Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 03, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2022: [Pro Se Litigant's Request for Issuance of Summons]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 19, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.