U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Prentice v. Oklahoma State of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • August 16, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 19, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • February 04, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 04, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 02, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 20, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 20, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 20, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.