U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Voegeli v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 01, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.