U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Wright v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 15, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • August 02, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
  • January 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.