U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00054
  • Case Name: Autry et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Grady County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Supplement]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 20, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Objections]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Case Stayed]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 01, 2022: [Stay Case]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice from the Court]
  • January 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 20, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.