U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00051
  • Case Name: Huff v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Exhibit]
  • January 05, 2023: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response to Non - Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Brief]
  • May 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 20, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • January 20, 2022: [Previous Cases]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.