U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00062
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Sandridge Energy Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 12, 2022: [Quash]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 12, 2022: [Docket]
  • April 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.