U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00059
  • Case Name: Shores v. Dennis
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 12, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • July 19, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Receipt]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • January 21, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.