U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Eckardt v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 13, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 15, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 14, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 11, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 21, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 21, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.