U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Bench v. Farris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Death Penalty)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 25, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA 30 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 23, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Other Hearing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2022: [Receipt]
  • January 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.