U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Calvert et al v. Oklahoma Gas & Electric Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • November 16, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 02, 2022: [Objections]
  • November 02, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • November 02, 2022: [Witness List]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 09, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.