U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Stevens Trucking Co v. Amazon.com Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • January 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • January 24, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.