U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Jackson et al v. Western Flyer Express LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • January 20, 2023: [Reopen Case]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 24, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.