U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Eagle v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 12, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 15, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 15, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.