U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Burch v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 07, 2022: [Stipulation]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • May 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 21, 2022: [Remand]
  • April 21, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 09, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 24, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.