U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Black v. Dennis
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 31, 2022: [Strike]
  • May 19, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [State Court Records Received - Conventional Filing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • May 13, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 10, 2022: [Declaration]
  • May 10, 2022: [Objections]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • May 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Objections]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [Strike]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order for Response]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Receipt]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 24, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.