U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Goode v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 01, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • August 04, 2022: [Remand to Agency]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 21, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 25, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.