U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Cowen v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • December 02, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 20, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 25, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 25, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.