U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Musick v. Nunn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 27, 2022: [Withdraw]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 25, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 25, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.