U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Chartier v. Marsau Enterprises Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Docket]
  • January 17, 2023: [Witness List]
  • January 17, 2023: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • January 12, 2023: [Leave]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 05, 2023: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 04, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Setting Settlement Conference]
  • December 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to Non - Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Objections]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Final Pretrial Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 06, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 06, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
  • December 06, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • December 06, 2022: [Docket]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 04, 2022: [Order]
  • December 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Docket]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • September 20, 2022: [Objections]
  • September 06, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 22, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 19, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 12, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order for Response]
  • August 05, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • August 05, 2022: [Witness List]
  • August 05, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 04, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2022: [Strike]
  • March 03, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 26, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.