U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00071
  • Case Name: Voyles v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 25, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Receipt]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 26, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.