U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Smith v. Dealers Auto Auction of Oklahoma City Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 21, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.