U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Quattlebaum v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 05, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Address Change]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 28, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 27, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 27, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.