U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Bowen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Order and Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
  • May 20, 2022: [USCA Order - without Notice of Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • April 29, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record Letter - Tenth Circuit]
  • April 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 28, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 28, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 30, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Receipt]
  • February 07, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 31, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 28, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 28, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 28, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 28, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.