U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Warledo v. Crow
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2022: [Receipt]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 24, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • February 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 31, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • January 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.