U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Chambers v. Carlisle Food Services Products Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • September 12, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Exhibit List / Witness List]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 30, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • March 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • January 31, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.