U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Harris v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 24, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • September 07, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 03, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.