U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Pearce v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendation]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • August 30, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Social Security Reply Brief]
  • July 18, 2022: [Social Security Response Brief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Social Security Opening Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • April 11, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 11, 2022: [Consent-Do Not Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 11, 2022: [General Order 16-04 and Consent Form]
  • April 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2022: [Social Security Admin Record]
  • April 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Social Security)]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.