U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Viviani v. Coffey and Associates Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • October 26, 2022: [Clarify]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Answer to Amended Counterclaim]
  • May 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2022: [Counterclaim (Amended)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • March 29, 2022: [Leave]
  • March 29, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 24, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • March 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
  • March 08, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer]
  • February 28, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • February 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 01, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.