U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Eden v. Stoker et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 06, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 04, 2023: [Letter]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 17, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 02, 2022: [Previous Cases]
  • February 02, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 02, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.