U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Kingdom Life Church v. GuideOne Specialty Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • December 07, 2022: [ADR Report by Mediator / Evaluator]
  • December 07, 2022: [Administrative Closing Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • October 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 11, 2022: [Exhibit List]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Witness List - Expert]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice to Take Deposition]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Affidavit of Service - NON SUMMONS]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Subpoena]
  • April 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Docket]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 25, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Filing Notice of Removal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • February 09, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Notice (other)]
  • February 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • February 03, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.